VA SJR78 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ78ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ78ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 150th anniversary of the swearing in of the first African American legislators to serve in the General Assembly. Commemorates the 150th anniversary of the swearing in of the first African American legislators to serve in the General Assembly and recognizes the individual legislators who served in the House of Delegates and the Senate.
Title
African American legislators; commemorating 150th anniv. of swearing in to serve General Assembly.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Mamie Locke [D] | Sen. Louise Lucas [D] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ78ER) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Taken up |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20105674D-E |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SJ78E |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Amendments by Senator McClellan agreed to |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented 20105674D |