VA SJR79 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Tabled in Rules (15-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Tabled in Rules (15-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorative commission; State Capitol; statue of Booker T. Washington. Expresses the General Assembly's support for and calls upon the Governor to establish a commemorative commission to honor Booker T. Washington with a statue in the State Capitol.
Title
Washington, Booker T.; honoring with a statue in the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: Tabled in Rules (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Tabled in Rules (15-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SJ79S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108019D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108019D-S1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20105622D |