VT H0624 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the protection of information in the statewide voter checklist
Title
An act relating to the protection of information in the statewide voter checklist
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 93, Nays = 47 (Y: 93 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | Bill Requested by Governor, Delivered on May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-05-01 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2018-05-01 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-04-26 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senator(s) White motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-04-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-16 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-02-15 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-15 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2018-02-15 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 93, Nays = 47 |
2018-02-15 | House | Rep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-15 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-16 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |