VT S0124 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Signed by Governor on October 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Signed by Governor on October 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to governmental structures protecting the public health, safety and welfare
Title
An act relating to governmental structures protecting the public health, safety and welfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor on October 7, 2020 |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on October 1, 2020 |
2020-09-24 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2020-09-24 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2020-09-24 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2020-09-24 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-23 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2020-09-23 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-09-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-09-22 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2020-09-22 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Copeland Hanzas of Bradford agreed to |
2020-09-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-09-22 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-09-22 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations as amended agreed to |
2020-09-22 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations amended as offered by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-22 | House | Rep. Townsend of South Burlington reported for the committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-22 | House | Rep. Copeland Hanzas of Bradford reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2020-09-22 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-09-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2020-06-25 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0 |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) White, Bray, Clarkson, Collamore, and Pollina |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2020-06-23 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-06-22 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-06-22 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Kitchel |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |