VT S0204 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Senate Message: Signed by Governor May 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Senate Message: Signed by Governor May 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to supporting Vermont's young readers through evidence-based literacy instruction
Title
An act relating to supporting Vermont's young readers through evidence-based literacy instruction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | House | Senate Message: Signed by Governor May 30, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | House | Senate Message: Report of Committee of Conference adopted |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2024-05-10 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Gulick for Committee, text |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2024-05-10 | Senate | House message: House adopted Conference Committee report |
2024-05-10 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2024-05-10 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2024-05-10 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2024-05-09 | Senate | House message: House appointed Conference Committee members |
2024-05-08 | House | Speaker appointed Reps. Brady of Williston, Brown of Richmond, and Taylor of Milton as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2024-05-08 | House | Senate Message: House proposal of amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference appointed |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campion |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Campion, Gulick, and Weeks |
2024-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Campion |
2024-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campion |
2024-05-08 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2024-05-07 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2024-05-07 | House | Read third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-05-07 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-05-06 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-05-06 | House | Report of Committee on Education agreed to |
2024-05-06 | House | Rep. Mihaly of Calais recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2024-05-06 | House | Rep. Brady of Williston reported for the Committee on Education |
2024-05-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-05-06 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-05-04 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-05-02 | House | Pending entry on Notice Calendar, referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-03-29 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Education |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Title amended as recommended by Committee on Education |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Gulick for Committee on Education |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |