VT S0289 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Action Calendar: Unfinished Business
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Action Calendar: Unfinished Business
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to age-appropriate design code
Title
An act relating to age-appropriate design code
Sponsors
Sen. Kesha Ram Hinsdale [D] | Sen. Alison Clarkson [D] | Sen. Ann Cummings [D] | Sen. Ruth Hardy [D] |
Sen. Wendy Harrison [D] | Sen. Andrew Perchlik [D] | Sen. Anne Watson [D] | Sen. Irene Wrenner [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ram Hinsdale, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | House | Action Calendar: Unfinished Business |
2024-05-10 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-05-09 | House | Rep. Priestley of Bradford moved to postpone action until 5/10/2024, which was agreed to |
2024-05-09 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-05-08 | House | Rep. Priestley of Bradford moved to postpone action until 5/09/2024, which was agreed to |
2024-05-08 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-05-07 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-22 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ram Hinsdale, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ram Hinsdale for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |