VT S0337 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor September 23, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor September 23, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to energy efficiency entities and programs to reduce greenhouse gas emissions in the thermal energy and transportation sectors
Title
An act relating to energy efficiency entities and programs to reduce greenhouse gas emissions in the thermal energy and transportation sectors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 2 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator McCormack, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 1 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator McCormack, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 1 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor September 23, 2020 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor on September 23, 2020 |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on September 17, 2020 |
2020-09-03 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2020-09-03 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2020-09-02 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2020-09-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-09-01 | House | Rep. Yantachka of Charlotte reported for the committee on Energy and Technology |
2020-09-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-05-20 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 2 |
2020-05-14 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator McCormack, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 1 |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Campion for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-05-19 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-05-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-11 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-03 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-04-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-03-30 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-03-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-03-13 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committed to the Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Bray |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Bray |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |