WA HB1008 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Effective date 1/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Effective date 1/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning participating in insurance plans and contracts by separated plan 2 members of certain retirement systems.
Title
Concerning participating in insurance plans and contracts by separated plan 2 members of certain retirement systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Effective date 1/1/2024. |
2023-04-25 | House | Chapter 164, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2023-02-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-01-23 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2022-12-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5420 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.