WA HB1144 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing requirements for the purchase or transfer of firearms.
Title
Enhancing requirements for the purchase or transfer of firearms.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] |
Rep. Chipalo Street [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-01-27 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5232 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 41 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 41 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 41 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 41 | 1135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |