WA HB1318 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House College & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House College & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for equity and access in the community and technical colleges.
Title
Providing for equity and access in the community and technical colleges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5194 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
28b | 15 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28b | 92 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28b | 92 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 96 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | 299 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1318&Year=2021&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1318.pdf |