WA SB5194 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for equity and access in the community and technical colleges.
Title
Providing for equity and access in the community and technical colleges.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by College & Workforce Development (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by College & Workforce Development (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 272, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-24 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-08 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1318 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Subjects
COMMUNITY AND TECHNICAL COLLEGES
COMMUNITY AND TECHNICAL COLLEGES, STATE BOARD FOR
LOW-INCOME PERSONS
MINORITIES
NAMED ACTS
PUBLIC POLICY, INSTITUTE FOR
STUDIES
SUBSTANCE USE DISORDER
TAXES - BUSINESS AND OCCUPATION
WORKER TRAINING AND WORKFORCE NEEDS
COMMUNITY AND TECHNICAL COLLEGES, STATE BOARD FOR
LOW-INCOME PERSONS
MINORITIES
NAMED ACTS
PUBLIC POLICY, INSTITUTE FOR
STUDIES
SUBSTANCE USE DISORDER
TAXES - BUSINESS AND OCCUPATION
WORKER TRAINING AND WORKFORCE NEEDS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
28b | 15 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28b | 92 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28b | 92 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 96 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | 299 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |