WA HB1433 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a sentence for treatment program for juvenile offenders.
Title
Creating a sentence for treatment program for juvenile offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Rep. David Sawyer [D] | Rep. Jessyn Farrell [D] | Rep. Kathryn Haigh [D] |
Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] |
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1433&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1433.pdf |