WA HB1726 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying certain vehicle registration renewal requirements.
Title
Modifying certain vehicle registration renewal requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Mary Roberts [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-27 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-27 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |