WA HB1726 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning impacts from wildlife damage.
Title
Concerning impacts from wildlife damage.
Sponsors
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Rep. Joyce McDonald [R] |
Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
SB5078 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1726&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1726.pdf |