WA HB1788 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Washington state bar association.
Title
Concerning the Washington state bar association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 26 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-22 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |