WA HB1903 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Effective date 1/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing unemployment insurance benefit charging relief for part-time employers who continue to employ a claimant on a part-time basis and the claimant qualified for two consecutive claims with wages attributable to at least one employer who employed the claimant in both base years.
Title
Providing unemployment insurance benefit charging relief for part-time employers who continue to employ a claimant on a part-time basis and the claimant qualified for two consecutive claims with wages attributable to at least one employer who employed the claimant in both base years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Effective date 1/1/2014. |
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 244, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2013-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-21 | House | LWD - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-21 | House | LWD - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development. |