WA HB1903 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying distillers' spirit sampling provisions.
Title
Modifying distillers' spirit sampling provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Mark Harmsworth [R] | Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] |
Rep. Christopher Hurst [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1903&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1903.pdf |