WA HB1915 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Environment.
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Environment.
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Developing recommendations to achieve the state's greenhouse gas emissions limits.
Title
Developing recommendations to achieve the state's greenhouse gas emissions limits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Environment. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-13 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-03-11 | House | APPG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-03-11 | House | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-11 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government. |
2013-03-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-03-06 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-06 | House | ENVI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 12:00 PM. |
2013-03-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Environment. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5802 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-02 - Effective date 4/2/2013.