WA HB1982 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of the community economic revitalization board with respect to loans and grants to political subdivisions and federally recognized Indian tribes for broadband.
Title
Concerning the authority of the community economic revitalization board with respect to loans and grants to political subdivisions and federally recognized Indian tribes for broadband.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-14 | House | Chapter 86, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | BFGT - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade. |
2024-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-02 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2024-01-16 | House | ICEV - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Community & Economic Development, & Veterans. |
2023-12-19 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 160 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 160 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |