WA HJM4004 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Naming a certain portion of state route number 110 the "Operations Desert Shield and Desert Storm Memorial Highway."
Title
Naming a certain portion of state route number 110 the "Operations Desert Shield and Desert Storm Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 1; absent, 1; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-25 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-01-22 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-01-19 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-19 | Referred to Rules. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-02-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-23 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-01-29 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-27 | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-01-27 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-27 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |