WA HJM4005 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 21 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-21 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the Postal Service to issue a postage stamp commemorating Nisei veterans.
Title
Requesting the Postal Service to issue a postage stamp commemorating Nisei veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2009-04-16 | President signed. | |
2009-04-15 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-14 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-14 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-13 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-04-06 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-18 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-19 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2009-02-18 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-02-18 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-17 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-13 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-13 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-13 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-21 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SJM8000 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.