WA HJM4014 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting that House Resolution 6922 or substantially similar legislation be enacted to help stabilize the trucking industry.
Title
Requesting that House Resolution 6922 or substantially similar legislation be enacted to help stabilize the trucking industry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2009-04-03 | President signed. | |
2009-04-01 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-03-31 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-31 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-18 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-16 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-03 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2009-02-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-02-27 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-24 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-24 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-18 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |