WA SB5175 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning written contracts between school boards and principals.
Title
Concerning written contracts between school boards and principals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Chapter 362, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 32; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2023-04-18 | House | House insists on its position and asks Senate to concur. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2023-04-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-06 | House | Committee amendment |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-28 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-27 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 400 | 300 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 405 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |