WA SB5187 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Effective date 5/16/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Effective date 5/16/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revised for 1st Substitute: Making 2023-2025 fiscal biennium operating appropriations and 2021-2023 fiscal biennium second supplemental operating appropriations.Original: Making 2023-2025 fiscal biennium operating appropriations.
Title
Revised for 1st Substitute: Making 2023-2025 fiscal biennium operating appropriations and 2021-2023 fiscal biennium second supplemental operating appropriations.Original: Making 2023-2025 fiscal biennium operating appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Effective date 5/16/2023. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 475, 2023 Laws PV. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. |
2023-04-23 | House | Passed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 58; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-23 | House | Conference committee report adopted. |
2023-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee report; received 2:15 PM 4/22/2023. |
2023-04-22 | House | Conference committee report; received 1:09 PM 4/22/2023. |
2023-04-17 | House | Conference committee appointed. Representatives Ormsby, Bergquist, Stokesbary. |
2023-04-17 | House | Conference committee request granted. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed. Senators Rolfes, Robinson, Wilson, L.. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon. |
2023-04-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-03 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-04-03 | House | Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill. |
2023-03-30 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-03-29 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:00 PM. |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1140 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - House Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 02 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 92 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 09 | 475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 101 | 200 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 320 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 43 | 837 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 79 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 79 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 030 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 46 | 561 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79a | 25 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |