WA SB5297 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the procedure for filing a declaration of completion of probate.
Title
Concerning the procedure for filing a declaration of completion of probate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to Senate Rules 3. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-22 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Floor amendment | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-13 | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to Senate Rules 3. | |
2009-03-30 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-30 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-03-27 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-18 | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-18 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-16 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-06 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-03 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-30 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-20 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |