WA SB5345 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a statewide industrial waste coordination program.
Title
Establishing a statewide industrial waste coordination program.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] |
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Environment & Energy (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Environment & Energy (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 308, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-10 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-01 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-26 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 56 | 270 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |