WA SB5391 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the powers, duties, and functions of the department of veterans affairs.
Title
Clarifying the powers, duties, and functions of the department of veterans affairs.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Chapter 185, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-03-31 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-15 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1534 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.