WA SB5418 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding electric vehicles.
Title
Regarding electric vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-01-30 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-21 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1481 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-12 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5418&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5418.pdf |