WA SB5621 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the jurisdictional amount for small claims courts.
Title
Increasing the jurisdictional amount for small claims courts.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Chapter 86, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-26 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |