WA SB5643 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the definition of "well" in RCW 18.104.020.
Title
Modifying the definition of "well" in RCW 18.104.020.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Douglas Ericksen [R] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Mary Haugen [D] |
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Harry Morton [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Sen. Val Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-07 | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Environment. | |
2011-12-07 | Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-03 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5643&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5643.pdf |