WA SB5643 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying theater license provisions.
Title
Modifying theater license provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1004 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.