WA SB5696 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing limited civil immunity from liability for apiarists.
Title
Providing limited civil immunity from liability for apiarists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | AWRD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |