WA SB5716 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding election requirements for the creation of municipal wards.
Title
Regarding election requirements for the creation of municipal wards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. | |
2009-03-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-05 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-23 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-29 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |