WA SB5737 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning impounds of vehicles used as residences.
Title
Concerning impounds of vehicles used as residences.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 55 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 68 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |