WA SB5833 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing certain procedures for tenants who are victims of sexual assault, sexual harassment, and stalking.
Title
Providing certain procedures for tenants who are victims of sexual assault, sexual harassment, and stalking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-18 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. | |
2009-02-12 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-04 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1856 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-07 - Effective date 7/26/2009.