WA SB5854 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for recreational licensing of smelt, crawfish, and carp.
Title
Providing for recreational licensing of smelt, crawfish, and carp.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2023-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1226 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-14 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Code Citations
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5854&Year=2023&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5854.pdf |