WA SB5894 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Including protected classes in the Washington equal pay and opportunities act.
Title
Including protected classes in the Washington equal pay and opportunities act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | LC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1905 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-28 - Effective date 7/1/2025.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 58 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 58 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 58 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 58 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |