WA SB5933 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a school seismic safety grant program.
Title
Establishing a school seismic safety grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Chapter 113, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-28 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-25 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2095 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-26 - First reading, referred to Capital Budget.