WA SB6050 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-15 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-15 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning restrictions on prescriptions for opiates.
Title
Concerning restrictions on prescriptions for opiates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2272 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-12 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6050&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6050.pdf |