WA SB6050 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning insurance guaranty fund.
Title
Concerning insurance guaranty fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-27 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2209 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.