WA SB6158 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning public facilities districts.
Title
Concerning public facilities districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | LGLT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 100 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 14 | 390 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 14 | 485 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |