WA SB6188 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-19 - Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-19 - Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
Pending: Senate Environment, Energy & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing authorities to address aerial firefighting aspects as part of permitting processes for communities at risk of wildfires.
Title
Authorizing authorities to address aerial firefighting aspects as part of permitting processes for communities at risk of wildfires.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | And refer to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | LGLT - Majority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government, Land Use & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2117 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
35a | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 70 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
80 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |