WA SJM8007 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting Congress to fully fund 40 percent of the costs of IDEA.
Title
Requesting Congress to fully fund 40 percent of the costs of IDEA.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2024-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-19 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |