WI AB277 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Published 3-12-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Published 3-12-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 13.92 (4) (c), 13.92 (4) (d), 13.92 (4) (e), 13.92 (4) (f), 35.93 (2) (b) 4., 35.93 (2) (c) 1., 35.93 (3), 35.93 (3) (e) (intro.), 35.93 (3) (e) 1., 227.01 (13) (intro.), 227.11 (2) (intro.) and 227.27 (2); and to create 13.92 (4) (bm) and 227.265 of the statutes; Relating to: rule-making procedures and modifying and repealing various rules promulgated by the Department of Financial Institutions. (FE)
Title
Rule-making procedures and modifying and repealing various rules promulgated by the Department of Financial Institutions. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Published 3-12-2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-11-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 136 |
2014-03-10 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-10-2014 |
2014-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Point of order withdrawn |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Point of order that Senate Amendment 1 not germane taken under advisement |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 12th order of business on the calendar of 11-12-2013 |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Erpenbach and Hansen |
2013-11-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-11-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-11-11 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-11-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-10-08 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-08 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-10-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-08 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 59, Noes 37 |
2013-10-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representatives Genrich, Smith, Barnes, Kessler, C. Taylor, Hebl, Pope, Ohnstad, Young, Sargent, Goyke and Ringhand |
2013-10-08 | House | Read a second time |
2013-10-08 | House | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 10-8-2013 |
2013-10-03 | House | Placed on calendar 10-8-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-09-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-09-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 10, Noes 3 |
2013-08-28 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-08-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-08-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Genrich, Richards and Sargent |
2013-08-27 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Genrich, Richards and Sargent |
2013-08-26 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Stroebel |
2013-08-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-08-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2013-08-07 | House | Introduced |