WI AB29 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Published 3-22-2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 77.54 (70) of the statutes; Relating to: a sales and use tax exemption for precious metal bullion. (FE)
Title
A sales and use tax exemption for precious metal bullion. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgment of the Senate (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgment of the Senate (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgment of the Senate (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Decision of the Chair stands as the judgment of the Senate (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Published 3-22-2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 149 |
2024-03-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | LRB correction |
2024-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 23, Noes 9 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Decision of the Chair stands as the judgment of the Senate, Ayes 22, Noes 10 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Point of order that Senate Amendment 2 was not germane well taken |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Decision of the Chair stands as the judgment of the Senate, Ayes 22, Noes 10 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Point of order that Senate Amendment 1 was not germane well taken |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Roys, Agard, Hesselbein, Smith, Larson, L. Johnson, Spreitzer, Pfaff, Wirch and Carpenter |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Carpenter, Wirch, Agard, Hesselbein, L. Johnson, Larson, Pfaff, Smith and Spreitzer |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 2 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 86, Noes 12 |
2024-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-19 | House | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2024-02-19 | House | Executive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions pursuant to s. 13.52, Wisconsin Statutes |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2024-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-01-02 | House | Representative Summerfield added as a coauthor |
2023-10-24 | House | Representative Maxey added as a coauthor |
2023-02-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-02-10 | House | Introduced |