WI AB297 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-14)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-14)
Status: Passed on December 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 346.17 (5), 346.22 (1) (b), 346.43 (1) (b) 3., 346.49 (1) (c), 346.60 (3m) (a), 346.65 (5m) and 349.11 (10); to amend 346.43 (4) (a), 346.43 (4) (b), 346.49 (5) (a), 346.49 (5) (b), 346.89 (4m) and 349.06 (3); and to create 340.01 (15pu), 346.17 (5) (b), 346.22 (1) (b) 2., 346.43 (1) (b) 3. b., 346.49 (1) (c) 2., 346.60 (3m) (a) 2., 346.65 (5m) (b) and 349.11 (10) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: traffic violations when emergency or roadside response vehicles are present and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Traffic violations when emergency or roadside response vehicles are present and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Representative Doyle added as a coauthor |
2021-12-07 | House | Published 12-7-2021 |
2021-12-07 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 115 |
2021-12-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021 |
2021-11-02 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-1-0001 |
2021-10-26 | House | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-26 | House | Senate Amendment 1 concurred in |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-20 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted) |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Ballweg |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-06-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-22 | House | Representatives Macco and L. Myers added as coauthors |
2021-06-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2021-06-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-06-09 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2021-06-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-05-03 | House | Introduced |