WI AB315 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.370 (1) (mu); and to create 23.118 of the statutes; Relating to: signs informing about Lyme disease in state parks, state trails, state recreational areas, and state forests and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Signs informing about Lyme disease in state parks, state trails, state recreational areas, and state forests and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-09-12 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2019-09-03 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-08-19 | House | Representative Oldenburg added as a coauthor |
2019-08-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-08-15 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2019-07-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab315 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB315.pdf |