WI AB415 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 134.405 (1) (f) 9. of the statutes; Relating to: regulating scrap dealer purchases of catalytic converters. (FE)
Title
Regulating scrap dealer purchases of catalytic converters. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-25 | House | Representatives Subeck, Hesselbein and Shankland added as coauthors |
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2021-12-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-12-08 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2021-09-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-28 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2021-09-21 | House | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-08-24 | House | Representative Hong added as a coauthor |
2021-08-04 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2021-06-28 | House | Representative Sinicki added as a coauthor |
2021-06-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2021-06-25 | House | Introduced |