WI AB433 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 450.19 (1) (a); to renumber and amend 450.19 (1) (b) and 450.19 (2) (a); to amend 15.405 (2) (a), 15.405 (17), 101.983 (title), 101.983 (1) (a), 101.983 (1) (b), 101.983 (1) (c) (intro.), 101.983 (1) (c) 1., 101.983 (1) (c) 2., 101.983 (1) (c) 3., 101.983 (1) (d) (intro.), 101.983 (1) (d) 1., 101.983 (1) (d) 2., 101.983 (2) (a), 101.983 (2) (c), 101.983 (3), 101.984 (3), 101.985 (3), 101.985 (5) (b) 1., 101.985 (5) (b) 2. b., 145.01 (5), 255.35 (1m) (g), 440.03 (13) (c), 440.974 (2), 441.01 (4), 441.04, 441.08, 441.10 (1), 441.10 (3) (e), 441.115 (1), 441.12 (2), 450.035 (1r), 450.035 (1t), 450.035 (2), 450.035 (2g), 450.05, 450.08 (1), 450.08 (2) (a), 450.085 (1), 450.19 (2) (intro.), 450.19 (2) (b), 450.19 (2) (d), 450.19 (2) (f), 450.19 (3) (a), 450.19 (3) (b), 452.01 (4) and 452.14 (4m) (intro.); to repeal and recreate 101.983 (2) (title); and to create 101.983 (4), 440.20 (5), 450.19 (2) (a) 2. and 450.19 (2) (a) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: the authority and responsibilities of the Department of Safety and Professional Services and the various boards under that department, the membership of the Cosmetology Examining Board, professional licensure of pharmacists, the Pharmacy Examining Board's operation of the prescription drug monitoring program, authorizing the construction, installation, alteration, operation, and inspection of elevators and other similar conveyances, and licensing requirements for elevator mechanics, inspectors, and contractors. (FE)
Title
The authority and responsibilities of the Department of Safety and Professional Services and the various boards under that department, the membership of the Cosmetology Examining Board, professional licensure of pharmacists, the Pharmacy Examining Board's operation of the prescription drug monitoring program, authorizing the construction, installation, alteration, operation, and inspection of elevators and other similar conveyances, and licensing requirements for elevator mechanics, inspectors, and contractors. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-30 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-01-30 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-01-30 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2014-01-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-12-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Kooyenga |
2013-12-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kooyenga |
2013-12-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-10-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2013-10-17 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab433 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB433.pdf |