WI AB433 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 5.05 (5s) (an) of the statutes; Relating to: submitting copies of complaints filed with the Elections Commission to the legislature.
Title
Submitting copies of complaints filed with the Elections Commission to the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-08-04 | House | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor |
2021-07-09 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2021-07-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2021-07-01 | House | Introduced |